求五年级简便计算题

问题描述:

你没看错我要的是五年级简便计算题不是提问

五年级 1个回答 分类:数学 2018-08-01

问题解答:

我来补答

1、9 × 37+9 ×63

=9×(37+63)

=9×100

=900

 

2、36×97-58×36+61×36

=36×(97-58+61)

=36×100

=3600

 

3、5000÷8÷125

=5000÷(8×125)

=5000÷1000

=5

 

4、25x(4+8)

=25×4+25×8

=100+200

=300

 

5、25 ×(20 + 4)

=25×20+25×4

=500+100

=600

 

6、45 × 7 + 55 × 7

=(45+55)×7

=100×7

=700

 

7、8 × 27 + 8 × 73

=8×(27+73)

=8×100

=800

 

8、329×101

=329×100+329×1

=32900+329

=33229

 

9、84x101

=84×100+84×1

=8400+84

=8484

 

10、2.5*32*0.125

=(2.5*4)*(8*0.125)

=10*1

=10

 

11、3.5-7+6.5

=3.5+6.5-7

=3

 

12、1.2×2.5+0.8×2.5?

=2.5(1.2+0.8)

=25

 

13、8.9×1.25-0.9×1.25?

=1.25(8.9-0.9)

=10

 

14、12.5×7.4×0.8?

=12.5×0.8×7.4

=74

 

15、6.5×9.5+6.5×0.5?

=6.5×(9.5+0.5)

=6.5×10

=65

 

16、0.35×1.6+0.35×3.4?

=0.35*(1.6+3.4)

=0.35*5

=1.75

 

17、6.72-3.28-1.72?

=6.75-(3.28+1.72)

=6.75-5

=1.75

 

18、0.45+6.37+4.55?

=0.45+4.55+6.37

=5+6.37

=11.37

 

19、28×12.5-12.5×20

=(28-20)*12.5

=8*12.5

=100

 

20、23.65-(3.07+3.65)?

=23.65-3.65-3.07

=20-3.07

=16.93

 

21、(4+0.4×0.25)8×7×1.25

=(4+1)*7*10

=5*7*10

=350

 

22、1.65×99+1.65?

=1.65*(99+1)

=1.65*100

=165

 

23、27.85-(7.85+3.4)?

=27.85-7.85+3.4

=20+3.4

=23.4

 

24、48×1.25+50×1.25×0.2×8?

7.8×9.9+0.78?

=7.8*(9.9+0.1)

=7.8*10

=78

 

25、4.8×46+4.8×54?

=(46+54)*4.8

=100*4.8

=480

 

26、673-327-173

=673-(327+173)

=673-500

=173

 

27、4.44*2.5

=1.11*(4*2.5)

=1.11*10

=11.1

 

28、3.5÷1.4

=(3.5÷0.7)÷(1.4÷0.7)

=5÷2

=2.5

?
?
展开全文阅读
剩余:2000
黄色视频网